There are many methods to memorize the multiplication table. You can be creative while memorizing multiplication tables, prepare rhymes  or sing your favorite song on  multiplication table but how it will feel if you don’t need to remember anything at all and  whenever you will need multiplication table it will come into your head according to demand. After completing this article you will never forget multiplication table ever. As to forget one must have to remember but with this method, you won’t have to remember anything at all.Average time to read the article is 5 minutes.

Once you learn multiplication table up to 99×99 you would be able to answer multiplication of two-digit numbers instantly. As the maximum value of two digits number can only go up to 99. If you increase 99 by 1 it will become 100 i.e  a three digit number.

What we meant by multiplication table up to 99×99 ?

It simply means you can take the first number from 1 to 99 and the second number from 1 to 99 too in the multiplication of two numbers.In the same way, meaning of 20 x 10 multiplication table is you can take the first  number from 1 to 20 and the second number from 1 to 10.

Start with smaller numbers:

To learn multiplication table up to 99×99 you must remember table up to at least 10×10 first.  Which I suppose you have remembered already.

For your convenience here is table up to 10×10

1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10
2 4 6 8 10 12 14 16 18 20
3 6 9 12 15 18 21 24 27 30
4 8 12 16 20 24 28 32 36 40
5 10 15 20 25 30 35 40 45 50
6 12 18 24 30 36 42 48 54 60
7 14 21 28 35 42 49 56 63 70
8 16 24 32 40 48 56 64 72 80
9 18 27 36 45 54 63 72 81 90
10 20 30 40 50 60 70 80 90 100

Okay! Get start now:Table up to 99×10

You must be facing difficulty while moving onto higher number in the multiple table. Here is the process for the higher number.

Suppose we take an Example: 18×9

18×9= (10+8)x9=90+72 = 90+10+62=162

While adding 90 and 72 try to add in chunks. Take 10 from 72 and give to 90 it will become 100. Then 100+ 62 will be equal to 162

Basically, multiplication process is being converted into addition and subtraction process here.

Take another Example: 87×7

87×7=80×7+7×7=560+49=560+40+9=609.

87 is equal to (80+7) multiply each one with 7 mentally and then add.

Take this example 38×6

38×6=180+48=228

Think 38 as 30+8, 30×6=180 , 8×6=48 , now add 180 and 48.

To add 180 +48 , take 20 from 48 , 180+20+28=200+28=228

Solve this example 99×7

99×7= (100-1)x7=700-7=693

Another  example: 49×80

First solve 49×8
(50-1)x8=400-8=392
Now 49×80= 3920

We manipulate multiplication into another form, so that process of multiplication become actually addition or subtraction.

Congrats! You have learnt enough to remember multiple table up to 99*10.Can you do this below table mentally with above process ?

11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20
22 24 26 28 30 32 34 36 38 40
33 36 39 42 45 48 51 54 57 60
44 48 52 56 60 64 68 72 76 80
55 60 65 70 75 80 85 90 95 100
66 72 78 84 90 96 102 108 114 120
77 84 91 98 105 112 119 126 133 140
88 96 104 112 120 128 136 144 152 160
99 108 117 126 135 144 153 162 171 180
110 120 130 140 150 160 170 180 190 200

Become expert in multiplication:Table up to 99×99

Okay now if you  nailed the above table easily.  We will move onto multiplication table up to 99×99.

Are you exited?

Don’t worry ,process is so damn easy.You will grasp it within  minutes of time.

Take this Example : 87×68

This can  be taken as follows:

87×68= 87x(60+8)= 87×60+ 87×8

Now solve mentally as follows:

Step 1: 87×6=522  Do this mentally. Method explained at the start of the article.

87×60=5220

Step 2: 87×8= 696 Do this mentally.

Step 3: Now add 5220 and 696:

If you haven’t read my Mental addition trick yet here it is summarized.

5220+696=5 thousand+ two hundreds +twenty + six hundred+ ninety +six

=5 thousand+ two hundreds+ six hundred +twenty(20) +ninety(90) +six

=5 thousand+8 hundred +hundred +ten +six

=5 thousand +9 hundred +sixteen

= 5916

Have you noticed something above?

I have written in words instead of digits. Because while we do mental calculation we just play with words instead of numbers. How fast you can speak?

According to various research.
An average human can articulate 120-150 words per minute for speech while one can process 350-500 words in a minute in head. So in a second one can process 6 to 10 words in head.

In multiplication process how many words we are processing only few words. So , with practice you will be able to multiply within seconds.

Additional methods:

Take some more examples: 99×24
It can be solved as 99*20 +99*4

But with any number close to 100 the below process will be more easy to process.
99*24=(100-1)*24=2400-24=2400-25 +1=2375 +1=2376

Another example:88×96

88×96= 88x(100-4)=8800-88×4=8800-352= 8000+800-350-2=8000+450-2=8448
normal process is 88×90 + 88×6

Use below process for any number close to 50.

Can you solve 52×34 mentally?

With normal process 52×34= 52×30+ 52×4= 1560+208=1000+500+60+200+8=1000+700+68=1768.You can solve this also by 34×50 +34×2=1700+68=1768.

However to solve this easily: 52×34=104×17=1700+68=1768
Here we have multiplied 52 by 2 and divided 34 by 2 . The net value will remain unchanged.

Another example:
49×84=(50-1)*84=50×84-84 =100×42-84=4200-84=4116.

Now try to practice this concept as much as possible to make it natural to you.

You won’t be benefited in terms of speed if you don’t practice it mentally.

So, you see how we have converted multiplication process into easy process of addition and subtraction.

Can you solve these questions 12×9 , 18×7, 19×8, 17×6, 23×45 , 51×76, 67×8 , 89×3 , 99×4 , 65×33 , 21×64 , 98×99

I hope you have enjoyed the article & you won’t need to remember multiplication table ever after reading this. Don’t forget to like and follow us.

I will recommend you to read Mental Addition Trick- Learn within 5 minutes to become an expert in mental addition.

And also read How to subtract numbers mentally at super fast speed  to become an expert in mental subtraction.


Niraj Tulsyan
Niraj Tulsyan

Btech in Electronics & Communication.I love Maths, Science & Technology.

    35 replies to "How to memorize multiplication table fast- table up to 99×99"

    • Geetha

      Hello, is there any trick to solve the problem below:

      A 100 digit number consisting of all 8’s is multiplied by a 100 digit number consisting of all 9’s. what is the sum of the digits in the product?

      Thanks

      • Niraj Tulsyan

        (88888….100 times)*(99999….100 times)= (88888….100 times)*(10^100-1)
        =(88888….100 times)10^100 – (88888….100 times)
        8888…8 0000…0
        – 8888…8
        ——————
        8888…7 1111…2
        ——————–
        The sum of digits in product=8*99 +7+1*99 +2=(8+1)99 +9= 9(99+1)=900
        Another method is try for , 8*9=72 , sum= 9=9*1
        88*99= 8712, sum =18=9*2
        888*999=888(1000-1)=888000-888=887112, sum =27=9*3
        Similarly for (88888….100 times)*(99999….100 times) , sum of digits=9*100 = 900

        I hope this will help.

    • Deepa

      Hi Niraj,

      I was searching for an easy method to remember tables. My son is in second std. and finds it difficult to memorize tables from 13 onwards.

      The method that you explained is really easy. I hope I’ll be able to explain it well to him so that he doesn’t get frustrated with rote learning the tables.

      I wish, I knew this technique earlier, while I was in school. 🙂

      Thanks!!

      • Niraj Tulsyan

        I’m happy that this article helped you.Thanks a lot.

    • sancia

      tankyou

    • dipanshu

      how can we extend it on fractions?

    • dipanshu

      how can we extend it on fractions?
      is there any such trick
      please help

    • Suraj Jha

      wow…..nice method to learn multiplication tables….
      Thankyou sir….

    • Ryan

      Brilliant! Thanks! It’s very helpful.

    • ramamohan

      Thanks you Niraj.

    • ramamohan

      This article helped me a lot in learning.

    • chetna

      Thanks Niraj.. Nicely described..👌

    • little samal

      thank u sir,you r a genious

    • Niraj Lohia

      Niraj bro…….i am getting little nervous when i am doing maths…..bro i am in class 11… So what should i do improving my maths….please help me….i am very weak in maths….

    • Amit

      Thanks !

    • Anirudh

      I know trick of 99 table
      Just write 9 table like this
      9
      1 8
      2 7
      3 6
      4 5
      5 4
      6 3
      7 2
      8 1

      and add 9 in leaved space
      99
      198
      297
      396
      495
      594
      693
      792
      891

    • Aman Saxena

      Really great ! Easy method

    • karan kataria

      absolutely fantastic !!

    • Ayush

      But I am not so intellegent in maths
      That’s why in am seeing difficulties in learning tables
      Please help me
      Thanks

      • Niraj Tulsyan

        Take help of one of your friends until you gain some confidence.Also keep reading articles here.

    • RK Khatri

      This method is not easy.
      When Kids can mulyiply any numbers then why to make 38 as 30+8 and then multiply it again with second number? Multiply straightforward!!

      • Niraj Tulsyan

        We are so much used to traditional methods that the easier method will look more difficult. If you go through Vedic Methods it will also look hard initially. The main aim of the method is that one must not use pen & paper to multiply and solve multiplications in mind itself. Initially it will be difficult to master but once mastered it will be piece of cake.

    • pooja

      thnq sir.. nyc trick

    • Sanjay Singh

      Thanks sir, it really works. I’m preparing for a job in banking and I found that it’s very helpful.

    • POONAM

      Very useful and easiest solutions

    • Akki

      Sir thanks a lot
      Beautifully explained

    • Vitus DSouza

      Hello,

      I found this method of multiplication very practical. Thanks for the excellent explanation!

    • Jayashri

      Niraj, ths article is very useful to me,,i solve the sums so quickly and easily Thank you

    • Vaibhav Mhais

      Thank you sir It is very useful for me

    • Pawan Rajput

      Thanks sir nyce trick

Leave a Reply

Your email address will not be published.

nineteen − 10 =